Refine your search

Refined by:

Wisconsin Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/29/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/18/2014