Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/05/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/27/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/09/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 07/08/2014