Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/22/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/29/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/18/2014