Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 05/22/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 05/22/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 05/22/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/22/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/18/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/27/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 01/07/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/31/2014