Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/26/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/28/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/20/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/17/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/31/2014