Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/20/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/22/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/29/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/30/2014