Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/31/2014