Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/05/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/05/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/26/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/04/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/29/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/06/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/14/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/19/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/14/2014