Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/22/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/10/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/30/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 08/01/2014