Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/26/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/26/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/26/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/07/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/28/2014