Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/20/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/22/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/05/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/12/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 11/19/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/19/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/21/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/12/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/28/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/31/2014