Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/09/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/15/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/21/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/25/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/05/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/14/2014