Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/23/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/23/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/04/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/13/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/20/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/19/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/10/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/01/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 10/22/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 11/13/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/10/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/11/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 07/25/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 11/12/2014