Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/17/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/17/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/21/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/21/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 05/21/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/24/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/24/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/04/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/04/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/04/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/04/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/06/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/06/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/10/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/11/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 06/11/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/11/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/13/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/24/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/24/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/24/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/24/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/24/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/24/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/24/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/24/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/24/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/11/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/15/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/15/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/22/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/30/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 08/02/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 09/20/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/20/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/27/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/22/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/22/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/13/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/14/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/18/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 11/20/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/02/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 12/03/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 12/09/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 12/11/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 12/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/15/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 01/15/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/15/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 01/28/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 02/03/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/21/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/21/2014