Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/09/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2013