Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/17/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/18/2013