Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 05/08/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/09/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/30/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/20/2014