Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/17/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/06/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/14/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/27/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/22/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/22/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/31/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 08/02/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 09/18/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 11/15/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 11/19/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/26/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/02/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/15/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/30/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/31/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/11/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 11/14/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 12/04/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/04/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/04/2014