Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 09/18/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/18/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/18/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/18/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/19/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/25/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/25/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/27/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/04/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/31/2014