There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1893. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/08/2013)

Keeping All Students Safe Act - Directs the Secretary of Education (Secretary) to establish minimum standards that:

  • prohibit elementary and secondary school personnel from managing any student by using any mechanical or chemical restraint, physical restraint or escort that restricts breathing, or aversive behavioral intervention that compromises student health and safety;
  • prohibit such personnel from using physical restraint or seclusion, unless such measures are required to eliminate an imminent danger of physical injury to the student or others and certain precautions are taken;
  • require states and local educational agencies (LEAs) to ensure that a sufficient number of school personnel receive state-approved crisis intervention training and certification in first aid and certain safe and effective student management techniques;
  • prohibit physical restraint or seclusion from being written into a student's education plan, individual safety plan, behavioral plan, or individual education program as a planned intervention; and
  • require schools to establish procedures to notify parents in a timely manner if physical restraint or seclusion is imposed on their child.

Authorizes the Secretary to award grants to states and, through them, competitive subgrants to LEAs to: (1) establish, implement, and enforce policies and procedures to meet such standards; (2) improve their capacity to collect and analyze data related to physical restraint and seclusion; and (3) implement school-wide positive behavior supports.

Requires LEAs to allow private school personnel to participate, on an equitable basis, in activities supported by such grants and subgrants.

Directs the Secretary to conduct a national assessment of this Act's effectiveness.

Gives Protection and Advocacy Systems the authority provided under the Developmental Disabilities Assistance and Bill of Rights Act of 2000 to investigate, monitor, and enforce this Act's protections for students.

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish standards for Head Start agencies that are consistent with the minimum standards for the management of elementary and secondary school students.

Authorizes the Secretary to allocate funds to the Secretary of HHS to assist Head Start agencies in establishing, implementing, and enforcing policies and procedures to meet such standards.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/08/2013 Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
07/08/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: House Education and the Workforce
05/22/2013 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2843)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/09/2013 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2538)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2013 Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2013 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (2)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced:

Keeping All Students Safe Act

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To prevent and reduce the use of physical restraint and seclusion in schools, and for other purposes.


Subjects (15)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Appropriations
  • Child health
  • Child safety and welfare
  • Department of Education
  • Department of Health and Human Services
  • Education programs funding
  • Elementary and secondary education
  • Emergency medical services and trauma care
  • Government studies and investigations
  • Preschool education
  • School administration
  • Special education
  • Teaching, teachers, curricula

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/21/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/25/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/27/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/15/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/21/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/17/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/17/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/18/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/20/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/25/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/30/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/09/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/09/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/09/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/09/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/09/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/09/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/11/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/11/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/15/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/15/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/15/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/15/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/16/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/28/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/08/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/15/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/15/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/08/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education07/08/2013 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.1893.