Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/21/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/25/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/27/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/15/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/21/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/17/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/17/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/18/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/20/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/25/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/30/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/09/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/09/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/09/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/09/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/09/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/09/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/11/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/11/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/15/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/15/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/15/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/15/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/16/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/28/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/08/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/15/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/15/2014