There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

International Child Support Recovery Improvement Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

International Child Support Recovery Improvement Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend part D of title IV of the Social Security Act to ensure that the United States can comply fully with the obligations of the Hague Convention of 23 November 2007 on the International Recovery of Child Support and Other Forms of Family Maintenance, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/18/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 27 (Roll no. 252).(text: CR H3700-3702)
05/08/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/19/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
06/18/2013-6:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/18/2013-6:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 27 (Roll no. 252). (text: CR H3700-3702)
06/18/2013-6:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3744)
06/18/2013-12:48pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/18/2013-12:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1896.
06/18/2013-12:35pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3700-3704)
06/18/2013-12:35pmHouseMr. Reichert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/14/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/03/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/08/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/08/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/08/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/08/2013HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E623)
05/08/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/08/2013 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources06/03/2013 Referred to
House Budget05/08/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary05/08/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations06/14/2013 Referred to
Senate Finance06/19/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1896. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/08/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

International Child Support Recovery Improvement Act of 2013 - (Sec. 2) Amends part D (Child Support and Establishment of Paternity) of title IV of the Social Security Act (SSA) to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to use the authorities otherwise provided by law to ensure U.S. compliance with any multilateral child support convention to which the United States is a party.

Authorizes access to the Federal Parent Locator Service (FPLS) by an entity designated as a Central Authority for child support enforcement in a foreign reciprocating country or a foreign treaty country (for which the 2007 Family Maintenance Convention is in force) so that foreign reciprocating countries will be notified of the state of residence of individuals sought for support enforcement.

Gives the state the option to require individuals applying for services relating to establishment of paternity or child support obligations who reside in a foreign reciprocating country or foreign treaty country to apply for such services with respect to a child through the Central Authority for child support enforcement in the foreign country. Allows the state to accept or reject the application of any individual residing in a foreign country that is not a foreign reciprocating country or a foreign treaty country.

(Sec. 3) Directs the Secretary of HHS to designate: (1) a nonproprietary and interoperable data exchange standard for any category of information required to be reported under SSA title IV part D, and (2) data exchange standards to govern reporting of such data.

(Sec. 4) Increases from 24 to 48 months the length of time information entered into the data base maintained by the National Directory of New Hires shall remain before being deleted.

Revises the authority of the Secretary of HHS to provide access to data in each component of the FPLS and to information reported by employers for certain research purposes. Limits such research to any undertaken by a state or federal agency for purposes likely to contribute to achieving the purposes of SSA title IV part A (Temporary Assistance for Needy Families) (TANF) or in SSA title IV part D. Authorizes the Secretary to provide access also for an evaluation or statistical analysis to assess the effectiveness of a federal program in achieving positive labor market outcomes (including through grant or contract) by specified federal departments and entities. Reverses the current prohibition against personal identifiers in such research to allow them if certain requirements are met.