There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Vietnam Human Rights Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Vietnam Human Rights Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote freedom and democracy in Vietnam.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
08/01/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 3 (Roll no. 435).(text: CR 7/31/2013 H5249-5251)
05/08/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
09/09/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
08/01/2013-4:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/01/2013-4:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 3 (Roll no. 435). (text: CR 7/31/2013 H5249-5251)
08/01/2013-4:06pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5295-5296)
07/31/2013-8:07pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/31/2013-7:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1897.
07/31/2013-7:45pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5249-5254)
07/31/2013-7:45pmHouseMr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/27/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/27/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/07/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/06/2013HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E815-816)
05/15/2013HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent .
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations
05/15/2013HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations
05/08/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/08/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
05/08/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/08/2013 Referred to
06/27/2013 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations05/08/2013 Referred to
05/15/2013 Markup by
05/15/2013 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific06/07/2013 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations09/09/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1897. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/01/2013)

Vietnam Human Rights Act of 2013 - Prohibits U.S. nonhumanitarian assistance to the government of Vietnam in excess of FY2012 amounts unless the President certifies to Congress that the government of Vietnam has made substantial progress respecting political, media, and religious freedoms, minority rights, access to U.S. refugee programs, return of confiscated religious estates and property, and actions to end trafficking in persons and the release of political prisoners.

Authorizes the President to waive such requirements if increased U.S. nonhumanitarian assistance would promote the purposes of this Act or is otherwise in the U.S. national interest. Allows the President to waive such authority with respect to: (1) all U.S. nonhumanitarian assistance to Vietnam; or (2) one or more programs, projects, or activities of such assistance.

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the United States should take measures to overcome the jamming of Radio Free Asia by Vietnam and that the Broadcasting Board of Governors should not cut staffing, funding, or broadcast hours for the Vietnamese language services of the Voice of America and Radio Free Asia; (2) U.S.-Vietnam educational and cultural exchange programs should promote freedom and democracy in Vietnam; (3) the Secretary of State should oppose Vietnam's candidacy for membership on the United Nations Human Rights Council (UNHRC); (4) Vietnam should be designated as a country of particular concern for religious freedom; and (5) Vietnam does not fully comply with the minimum standards for the elimination of trafficking and is not making significant efforts to bring itself into compliance.

Directs the President to report annually to Congress regarding Vietnam's compliance with the provisions of this Act.