Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/13/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/06/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 06/10/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/25/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/27/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 06/27/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/28/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/28/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/15/2013