Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/09/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/16/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/05/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/18/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/08/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/08/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/15/2013