Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 08/01/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 08/01/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/01/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/10/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/10/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/12/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/12/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/19/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/25/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/23/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/18/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 12/04/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 12/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/19/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/08/2014