Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/15/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/17/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/03/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/14/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/10/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/09/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/12/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/09/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/09/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/29/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/09/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/28/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/28/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 08/01/2014