There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

FREE Act
Federal Repeal of Expensive Exchanges Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal certain provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act relating to the premium tax credits and cost-sharing subsidies.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/09/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
07/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/10/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/09/2013Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/09/2013Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/09/2013Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/09/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/13/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 06/13/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/19/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/25/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/26/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/26/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/22/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/12/2013

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means05/09/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/09/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/10/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce05/09/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions07/08/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1908.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1908. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/09/2013)

Federal Repeal of Expensive Exchanges Act or the FREE Act - Repeals provisions of the Internal Revenue Code and the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) providing for: (1) a health insurance premium assistance tax credit and advance payments for credit amounts, (2) reductions in out-of-pocket health care expenses for certain low income taxpayers (cost-sharing) and advance payments of cost-sharing amounts, (3) the individual mandate to purchase health care coverage under PPACA, and (4) the employer mandate to provide health care coverage to employees under PPACA and the reporting requirements with respect to such mandate.