Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/13/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 06/13/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/19/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/25/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/26/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/26/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/22/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/12/2013