Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/23/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/04/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/04/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/04/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/04/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/05/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/17/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/18/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/25/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/14/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/19/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/30/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/20/2014