Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/13/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/31/2014