Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/19/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/25/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/22/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/28/2014