Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/09/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/09/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/14/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/16/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/17/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/11/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/11/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/14/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/17/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/25/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/26/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/19/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 10/11/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/23/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/11/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/10/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 01/16/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 01/16/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/28/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 01/28/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/28/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 01/28/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 01/28/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/28/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/26/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/12/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/02/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/29/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/29/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/29/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/29/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/01/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/01/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/01/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/12/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 06/19/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/19/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 07/08/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/28/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/28/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/28/2014