Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/22/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 05/22/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/23/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/04/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/04/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/04/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/05/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/06/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/13/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/13/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/13/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/13/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/17/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/17/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/17/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/25/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/28/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/28/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/28/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/08/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/08/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/08/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/09/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/10/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/18/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/26/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/27/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 10/15/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/14/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/04/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/26/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/13/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/09/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/09/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/22/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/11/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/17/2014