Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/14/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/03/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/03/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/03/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/18/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/18/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/26/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/18/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/10/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/10/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/15/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/29/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/29/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 01/14/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/06/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/11/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/29/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/19/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/30/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/12/2014