Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/26/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/23/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/12/2013