Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/08/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/22/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/24/2013