Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/16/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/25/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/27/2014