Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/09/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/16/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/25/2014