Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/21/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 08/02/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/18/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/03/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/12/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/25/2014