Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/12/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/2014