There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Improving Postsecondary Education Data for Students Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Postsecondary Education Data for Students Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Education to convene the Advisory Committee on Improving Postsecondary Education Data to conduct a study on improvements to postsecondary education transparency at the Federal level.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/22/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2895-2896)
05/20/2013Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 113-83.
05/13/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
05/23/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
05/22/2013-7:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/22/2013-7:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2895-2896)
05/22/2013-7:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1949.
05/22/2013-7:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2895-2898)
05/22/2013-7:03pmHouseMr. Messer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/20/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 58.
05/20/2013HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 113-83.
05/16/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/16/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/13/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
05/13/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 05/13/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/13/2013 Referred to
05/16/2013 Markup by
05/20/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-83
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/23/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1949.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1949. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (05/20/2013)

Improving Postsecondary Education Data for Students Act - Directs the Secretary of Education to convene an Advisory Committee on Improving Postsecondary Education Data that: (1) is comprised of 15 members who represent economically, racially, and geographically diverse populations; and (2) includes higher education stakeholders, state officials, business representatives, college and career counselors at secondary schools, and experts in higher education policy, consumer choice, privacy, labor markets, and data policy, collection, and use.

Requires the Committee to study:

  • the types of information the federal government should collect and report on institutions of higher education (IHEs) to assist students and families in their search for an IHE, including information related to postsecondary education costs, financial assistance, student outcomes, and postgraduation earnings;
  • how that information should be collected and reported, including how to disaggregate student outcome information by student subgroups; and
  • ways in which the federal government could make that information more readily available to students and their families in an easily accessible and understandable format, and to states, local governments, secondary schools, IHEs, and private-sector entities.

Requires the Committee, in conducting the study, to: (1) review relevant research concerning the types of information students and parents seek in searching for an IHE; (2) consider the utility of the information currently reported and whether additional information would be beneficial or confusing; and (3) consult with parents, students, and a broad range of parties interested in higher education.

Directs the Committee to submit an interim and final report on the study to Congress and the Secretary. Requires the Committee, after consulting with the Commissioner of Education Statistics, to include in its final report recommendations for legislative, regulatory, and administrative actions to improve the information the federal government collects and reports on IHEs.