Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/15/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/15/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/21/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/08/2013