Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/04/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/22/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/15/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/15/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/10/2013