There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Free Flow of Information Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To maintain the free flow of information to the public by providing conditions for the federally compelled disclosure of information by certain persons connected with the news media.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/14/2013 Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/14/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/14/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/14/2013 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2013 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/15/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/20/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 05/20/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/20/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/21/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/21/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/03/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/03/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/04/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/04/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/05/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/05/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/05/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/11/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/11/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/25/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/25/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/10/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 07/26/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/26/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/14/2014
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Sponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/20/2013 07/16/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/14/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet06/14/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations06/14/2013 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (13)

  • Business records
  • Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
  • Evidence and witnesses
  • First Amendment rights
  • Health information and medical records
  • Internet and video services
  • Judicial procedure and administration
  • News media and reporting
  • Right of privacy
  • Telephone and wireless communication
  • Terrorism
  • Trade secrets and economic espionage

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1962. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/14/2013)

Free Flow of Information Act of 2013 - Prohibits a federal entity (an entity or employee of the judicial or executive branch or an administrative agency of the federal government), in any matter arising under federal law, from compelling a covered person to testify or produce any document related to information obtained or created as part of engaging in journalism unless a court makes specified determinations by a preponderance of the evidence, including determinations that: (1) alternative sources have been exhausted; (2) the testimony or document sought is critical to the investigation, prosecution, or defense of a crime or the successful completion of a noncriminal matter; (3) disclosure of an information source's identity is necessary to prevent an act of terrorism, harm to national security, imminent death, significant bodily harm or to identify a person who has disclosed a trade secret, individually identifiable health information, or certain nonpublic personal information; and (4) the public interest in compelling disclosure of the information or document involved outweighs the public interest in gathering or disseminating news or information.

Defines "covered person" as a person who, for financial gain or livelihood, is engaged in journalism, including a supervisor, employer, parent, subsidiary, or affiliate of such a person. Excludes from that definition foreign powers and their agents and certain designated foreign terrorist organizations.

Defines "journalism" as the gathering, preparing, collecting, photographing, recording, writing, editing, reporting, or publishing of news or information that concerns local, national, or international events or other matters of public interest for dissemination to the public.

Requires the content of compelled testimony or documents to be limited and narrowly tailored.

Prohibits this Act from being construed as applying to civil defamation, slander, or libel claims or defenses under state law.

Applies this Act to communications service providers with regard to testimony or any record, information, or other communication that relates to a business transaction between such providers and covered persons. Sets forth notice requirements. Permits a court to delay notice to a covered person upon determining that such notice would pose a substantial threat to the integrity of a criminal investigation.