Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/20/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 05/20/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/20/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/21/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/03/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/04/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/04/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/05/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/05/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/11/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/11/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/25/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/10/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/14/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew