Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/15/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/21/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/03/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/05/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/08/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 07/26/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/26/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/13/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew