Committees: H.R.1963 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/14/2013 Referred to
07/31/2013 Markup by
10/22/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-249
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power05/15/2013 Referred to
05/23/2013 Hearings by
07/31/2013 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources12/09/2013 Referred to
06/18/2014 Markup by
07/31/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-231
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power02/27/2014 Hearings by