Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/14/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 05/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/14/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/15/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/15/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/15/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/17/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/17/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/04/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/04/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/19/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/27/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/22/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/29/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/14/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/04/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 01/15/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/16/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/16/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/04/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/04/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/19/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/09/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/09/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/23/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/09/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/09/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/25/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/29/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/08/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/08/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/04/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 12/04/2014