Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/09/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/10/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/25/2014